VA SB1410 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1410

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Active military or a military spouse; prohibits discrimination in public accommodations, etc. Prohibits discrimination in public accommodations, employment, and housing on the basis of a person's military status, defined as a member of the uniformed services of the United States or a reserve component thereof or a spouse or other dependent of the same. The bill also prohibits terms in a rental agreement in which the tenant agrees to waive remedies or rights under the federal Servicemembers Civil Relief Act prior to the occurrence of a dispute between the landlord and the tenant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Active military or a military spouse; prohibits discrimination in public accommodations, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 478 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1410ER)
2021-02-22SenateEnrolled
2021-02-18SenateTitle replaced 21200027D-H1
2021-02-18SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1410H1
2021-02-16HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21200027D-H1
2021-02-16HouseRead third time
2021-02-15HouseRead second time
2021-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 21200027D-H1
2021-02-11HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1410S1
2021-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103422D-S1
2021-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-01SenateRead second time
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103422D-S1
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102968D

Same As/Similar To

SB1410 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
HB2161 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
HB2161 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521500.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1521507(n/a)See Bill Text
1521604(n/a)See Bill Text
152853(n/a)See Bill Text
152854(n/a)See Bill Text
152965(n/a)See Bill Text
222901.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223004(n/a)See Bill Text
223900(n/a)See Bill Text
223901(n/a)See Bill Text
223902(n/a)See Bill Text
223904(n/a)See Bill Text
223905(n/a)See Bill Text
221295.2(n/a)See Bill Text
221306(n/a)See Bill Text
5511208(n/a)See Bill Text
5511310(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1410
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1410+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1410S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1410H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1410ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0478+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200027D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1410F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1410FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1410FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1410FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0046+SB1410
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0184SB1410+SB1410
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0228SB1410+SB1410
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0011+SB1410
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1591+SB1410
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0131SB1410+SB1410

Bill Comments 750

feedback