VA SB1408 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1408
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Joint Commission on Health Care; sunset. Repeals the sunset provision for the Joint Commission on Health Care.
Title
Health Care, Joint Commission on; repeals sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 315 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1408ER) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102395D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1408 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote