VA SB1408 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1408

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Joint Commission on Health Care; sunset. Repeals the sunset provision for the Joint Commission on Health Care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care, Joint Commission on; repeals sunset provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateReported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102395D

Same As/Similar To

SB1408 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback