VA SB1404 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School Readiness Committee; renaming as Commission on Early Childhood Care and Education; purpose; membership; powers and duties. Renames the School Readiness Committee as the Commission on Early Childhood Care and Education and makes several changes to the Commission, including adjusting its purpose, increasing and adjusting its membership, and establishing eight enumerated powers and duties for the Commission.
Title
School Readiness Committee; renaming as Commission on Early Childhood Care and Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009) | |
2023-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 9 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1404ER) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23102800D-E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1404E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102800D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1423 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
HB1423 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
HB1423 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)