VA SB1404 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1404
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater Local Assistance Fund; grant requirements. Authorizes grants from the Stormwater Local Assistance Fund awarded for projects related to Chesapeake Bay total maximum daily load (TMDL) requirements to take into account total phosphorus reductions or total nitrogen reductions. The bill authorizes grants awarded for eligible projects in localities with high or above average fiscal stress as reported by the Commission on Local Government to account for more than 50 percent of the costs of a project.
Title
Stormwater Local Assistance Fund; grants awarded for projects related to Chesapeake Bay.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102801D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1404 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.15:29.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |