VA SB1402 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Trout fishing in stocked waters. Equalizes for residents and nonresidents requirements to fish in designated stocked trout waters. The bill requires either such person to possess (i) a regular season state or county fishing license or a trip fishing license valid for at least five days and (ii) a trout license or a special lifetime trout fishing license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trout fishing in stocked waters; equalizes for residents and nonresidents requirements to fish.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2021-01-29SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-19SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N)
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102080D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291311(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback