VA SB1401 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Forensic Science; possession of unlawful items by employees; immunity. Provides that a Department of Forensic Science employee may lawfully possess or transfer contraband items or materials while engaged in the performance of his official duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forensic Science, Department of; possession of unlawful items by employees, immunity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 507 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1401ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-25SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102176D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
911101.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1401
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1401+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1401ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0507+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0042+SB1401
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0151SB1401+SB1401
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0178SB1401+SB1401
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0179SB1401+SB1401
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0180SB1401+SB1401
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0026+SB1401
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0035+SB1401
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0257+SB1401
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2946+SB1401
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2989+SB1401

Bill Comments

feedback