VA SB1400 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1400
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Wildlife Resources; quitclaim and conveyance of easement; Tazewell County. Authorizes the Board of Wildlife Resources to quitclaim any interest in a parcel of land and convey a right-of-way easement to the Valerie H. MacDowell Trust. The quitclaim is a result of a boundary line correction of an acquisition by the Board and applies to an unimproved parcel of land containing about 13.6 acres on the watershed of Little Tumbling Creek. The easement, which will follow an existing road and bridge across a portion of the Clinch Mountain Wildlife Management Area, will allow ingress and egress to the MacDowell Trust property from State Route 607. The MacDowell Trust shall be solely responsible for the maintenance and upkeep of the easement.
Title
Tazewell County; quitclaim and conveyance of easement by Board of Wildlife Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102717D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1400 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote