VA SB1400 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Poker; definition of illegal gambling and charitable gaming; poker games authorized; regulation of poker tournaments. Provides that poker is a game of skill and therefore not illegal gambling. The bill also allows a qualified organization to conduct poker games in conjunction with its charitable gaming activities, but does not allow a charitable organization to conduct poker tournaments. The bill requires the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services and the Charitable Gaming Board to regulate poker tournaments, defined in the bill as a competition organized for the purpose of conducting poker games at one or multiple tables where (i) competitors play a series of poker games, (ii) prizes are awarded to winning players on a fixed or proportional payout basis, and (iii) the total prize amount awarded to all winning players at the event is $50,000 or more. Finally, the bill requires poker tournament sponsors to obtain a permit before conducting a tournament and tournament managers and operators to be registered with the Department. The bill contains technical amendments. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Poker; definition of illegal gambling and charitable gaming.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (19-Y 19-N) (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-21HouseLeft in General Laws
2017-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2017-02-06HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-27SenateChair votes Yes
2017-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (19-Y 19-N)
2017-01-26SenatePrinted as engrossed 17102020D-E
2017-01-26SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1400E
2017-01-26SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-01-26SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-01-26SenateRead second time
2017-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (8-Y 7-N)
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102020D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182325(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.16(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.19(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.22(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.28:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.33(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.39(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.55(n/a)See Bill Text
222456(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback