VA SB1399 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0272)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; essential health benefits benchmark plan. Requires the Bureau of Insurance to select a new essential health benefits benchmark plan for the 2025 plan year that includes, in addition to the essential health benefits package included in the existing benchmark plan, coverage for prosthetic devices and components and formula and enteral nutrition products as medicine. The bill contains an emergency clause. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Health Insurance Reform Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Essential health benefits benchmark plan; Bureau of Insurance to select a new plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0272)
2023-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 272 (effective - see bill)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-25SenateSigned by President
2023-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1399ER)
2023-02-23SenateEnrolled
2023-02-20SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2023-02-17HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2023-02-17HouseRead third time
2023-02-16HouseRead second time
2023-02-14HouseReported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
2023-02-10HouseRead first time
2023-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-02SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1399S1
2023-02-02SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23105818D-S1
2023-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-02SenateRead second time
2023-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105818D-S1
2023-01-30SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2023-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/23

Same As/Similar To

HB2198 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
HB2198 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823418.15(n/a)See Bill Text
3823418.18(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1399
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1399+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1399S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1399ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0272+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105818D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+SB1399AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+SB1399AHE
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1399F171+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1399FS1171+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1399FER171+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S02V0072+SB1399
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0193SB1399+SB1399
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0209SB1399+SB1399
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0210SB1399+SB1399
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H23V0146+SB1399
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1967+SB1399
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0654SB1399+SB1399

Bill Comments

feedback