VA SB1399 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1399
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tourism Development Authority; name change. Renames the Tourism Development Authority, also known as the Virginia Coalfield Regional Tourism Development Authority, as the Heart of Appalachia Tourism Authority. The bill contains technical amendments. Tourism Development Authority; name change. Renames the Tourism Development Authority, also known as the Virginia Coalfield Regional Tourism Development Authority, as the Heart of Appalachia Tourism Authority. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Tourism Development Authority; name change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 384 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1399ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100596D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1399 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 5500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 246 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |