VA SB1399 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1399
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tourism Development Authority; name change. Renames the Tourism Development Authority, also known as the Virginia Coalfield Regional Tourism Development Authority, as the Heart of Appalachia Tourism Authority. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Tourism Development Authority; name change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100596D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1399 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 5500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 246 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |