VA SB1398 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0661)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0661)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Motor Vehicles; driving under the influence of alcohol, drugs, or a combination thereof; data collection and reporting. Requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to collect and disseminate, on an annual basis, statewide and locality-level data related to driving under the influence of alcohol, drugs, or a combination thereof. The bill requires the Department to submit an annual report on the data collected on or before October 1 to the General Assembly, the Governor, and the Virginia State Crime Commission and to make such data available to the public on the website of the Department. The bill provides that the Department shall not be required to submit the first annual report prior to October 1, 2024, and that the first annual report shall include data from calendar year 2019 through calendar year 2023. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Driving under the influence of alcohol, drugs, or a combination thereof; data collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0661) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 661 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1398ER) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Title replaced 23106687D-H1 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1398H1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23106687D-H1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106687D-H1 |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1398E |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23104303D-E |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104303D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2204 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
HB2204 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
HB2204 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)