VA SB1398 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1398
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retail sales and transient occupancy taxes on room rentals. Provides that retail sales and hotel taxes on transient room rentals shall be computed on the basis of the total charges or the total price paid for the use or possession of the room. For those cases in which a hotel or similar establishment contracts with an intermediary to facilitate the sale of the room and the intermediary charges the customer for the room and such facilitation efforts, the bill requires the intermediary to separately state the taxes on the bill or invoice provided to the customer and to collect the taxes based upon the total charges or the total price paid for the use or possession of the room. The bill requires an amount equal to the estimated state sales tax revenue generated from the tax on accommodations fees to be appropriated to the Virginia Tourism Authority each fiscal year to be used for promoting tourism. Retail sales and transient occupancy taxes on room rentals. Provides that retail sales and hotel taxes on transient room rentals shall be computed on the basis of the total charges or the total price paid for the use or possession of the room. For those cases in which a hotel or similar establishment contracts with an intermediary to facilitate the sale of the room and the intermediary charges the customer for the room and such facilitation efforts, the bill requires the intermediary to separately state the taxes on the bill or invoice provided to the customer and to collect the taxes based upon the total charges or the total price paid for the use or possession of the room. The bill requires an amount equal to the estimated state sales tax revenue generated from the tax on accommodations fees to be appropriated to the Virginia Tourism Authority each fiscal year to be used for promoting tourism.
Title
Retail sales and transient occupancy taxes; room rentals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (31-Y 6-N) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 383 (effective - see bill) | |
2021-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1398ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (31-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | VOTE: Passage (66-Y 34-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed House with amendments (66-Y 34-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2021-02-19 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-15 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (15-Y 7-N) |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1398S2 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Norment agreed to 21104395D-S2 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 21103546D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21104395D-S2 (Norment) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103546D-S1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100870D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1398 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Subjects
Hotels Restaurants Summer Camps and Campgrounds
Retail Sales and Use Tax
Sales and Use Tax
Taxation
Transient Tax
Retail Sales and Use Tax
Sales and Use Tax
Taxation
Transient Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2320.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3818.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3819 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3819.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3823 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3824 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3825 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3825.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3825.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3826 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3842 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3843 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 612.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |