VA SB1396 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Sewage; Onsite Sewage Indemnification Fund; Wastewater Sewage; Onsite Sewage Indemnification Fund; Wastewater Infrastructure Policy Working Group; report. Authorizes the State Board of Health to use the Onsite Sewage Indemnification Fund to provide grants and loans to property owners with income at or below 200 percent of the federal poverty guidelines to repair failing onsite sewage systems or install onsite sewage systems on properties that lack adequate sewage disposal. The bill provides that no expenses shall be paid from the Fund to support the program for training and recognition of onsite soil evaluators, or to provide grants or loans to repair failing onsite sewage systems or install onsite sewage systems on properties that lack adequate sewage disposal in lieu of payment to any owner or owners qualified to receive payment from the Fund. The bill also directs the Board to adopt regulations that include consideration of the impacts of climate change on proposed treatment works. The bill sets out the policy of the Commonwealth regarding wastewater infrastructure and establishes the four-member Wastewater Infrastructure Policy Working Group as an advisory board in the executive branch of state government to continually assess wastewater infrastructure needs and develop policy recommendations. The bill provides that the Working Group shall expire in 2030. The bill also directs the Department of Environmental Quality, in partnership with the Virginia Department of Health and in consultation with stakeholders, to estimate and report every four years the amount of wastewater infrastructure funding that is necessary to meet policy goals but is not eligible to be covered by grant funding pursuant to the Virginia Water Quality Improvement Act of 1997.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Onsite Sewage Indemnification Fund; use of Fund for grants to certain property owners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N)
2021-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 0-N 3-A)
2021-01-26SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-26SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 3-N)
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102943D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321164(n/a)See Bill Text
321164.1:01(n/a)See Bill Text
621223.1(n/a)See Bill Text
621223.2(n/a)See Bill Text
621223.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback