VA SB1395 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Threats of death or bodily injury to a health care provider. Provides that any person who orally makes a threat to kill or to do bodily injury against any health care provider who is engaged in the performance of his duties in a hospital or in an emergency room on the premises of any clinic or other facility rendering emergency medical care is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor, unless the person is on the premises of the hospital or emergency room as a result of an emergency custody order, an involuntary temporary detention order, an involuntary hospitalization order, or an emergency custody order of a conditionally released acquittee.
Title
Health care provider; threats of death or bodily injury to a provider, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 10-N) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 10-N) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 506 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1395ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 19106754D-H1 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute (90-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1395H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106754D-H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106754D-H1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1395S1 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104936D-S1 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104936D-S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101473D |