VA SB1393 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1393
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Replacement and conservation of trees during development; work group. Gives a locality the ability to exceed general requirements in its tree replacement and conservation ordinances in specific circumstances, including development that impacts stormwater permit requirements, recurrent flooding, formerly redlined areas, and comprehensive plan compliance. The bill also directs the Secretary of Natural Resources and Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to convene a stakeholder work group for the purpose of developing and providing recommendations to state and local governments related to policies that encourage the conservation of mature trees and tree cover on sites being developed, increase tree canopy cover in communities, and encourage the planting of trees. The bill will not become effective unless reenacted by the 2022 Session of the General Assembly, but the stakeholder work group is effective in due course.
Title
Trees; replacement and conservation during development, effective clause.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090) | |
2021-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 90 (effective - see bill) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1393ER) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (31-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Passed House with amendments (56-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2021-02-15 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (14-Y 7-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21103659D-ES1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1393ES1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Marsden agreed to |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Marsden withdrawn 21103814D-S2 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103659D-S1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21103814D-S2 (Marsden) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103659D-S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102865D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1393 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
HB2042 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
HB2042 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
HB2042 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
HB2042 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)