VA SB1393 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1393
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Replacement and conservation of trees during development. Gives a locality the ability to exceed general requirements in its tree replacement and conservation ordinances in specific circumstances, including development that impacts stormwater permit requirements, recurrent flooding, formerly redlined areas, and comprehensive plan compliance. The bill also directs the Secretary of Natural Resources and Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to convene a stakeholder work group for the purpose of developing and providing recommendations to state and local governments related to policies that encourage the conservation of mature trees and tree cover on sites being developed, increase tree canopy cover in communities, and encourage the planting of trees. This bill only becomes effective if reenacted during the 2022 Session of the General Assembly. Replacement and conservation of trees during development. Gives a locality the ability to exceed general requirements in its tree replacement and conservation ordinances in specific circumstances, including development that impacts stormwater permit requirements, recurrent flooding, formerly redlined areas, and comprehensive plan compliance. The bill also directs the Secretary of Natural Resources and Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to convene a stakeholder work group for the purpose of developing and providing recommendations to state and local governments related to policies that encourage the conservation of mature trees and tree cover on sites being developed, increase tree canopy cover in communities, and encourage the planting of trees. This bill only becomes effective if reenacted during the 2022 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Trees; replacement and conservation during development.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21103659D-ES1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1393ES1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Marsden agreed to |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Marsden withdrawn 21103814D-S2 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103659D-S1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21103814D-S2 (Marsden) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103659D-S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102865D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1393 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote