VA SB1392 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Consumer Data Protection Act. Establishes a framework for controlling and processing personal data in the Commonwealth. The bill applies to all persons that conduct business in the Commonwealth and either (i) control or process personal data of at least 100,000 consumers or (ii) derive over 50 percent of gross revenue from the sale of personal data and control or process personal data of at least 25,000 consumers. The bill outlines responsibilities and privacy protection standards for data controllers and processors. The bill does not apply to state or local governmental entities and contains exceptions for certain types of data and information governed by federal law. The bill grants consumer rights to access, correct, delete, obtain a copy of personal data, and to opt out of the processing of personal data for the purposes of targeted advertising. The bill provides that the Attorney General has exclusive authority to enforce violations of the law, and the Consumer Privacy Fund is created to support this effort. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023. Consumer Data Protection Act. Establishes a framework for controlling and processing personal data in the Commonwealth. The bill applies to all persons that conduct business in the Commonwealth and either (i) control or process personal data of at least 100,000 consumers or (ii) derive over 50 percent of gross revenue from the sale of personal data and control or process personal data of at least 25,000 consumers. The bill outlines responsibilities and privacy protection standards for data controllers and processors. The bill does not apply to state or local governmental entities and contains exceptions for certain types of data and information governed by federal law. The bill grants consumer rights to access, correct, delete, obtain a copy of personal data, and to opt out of the processing of personal data for the purposes of targeted advertising. The bill provides that the Attorney General has exclusive authority to enforce violations of the law, and the Consumer Privacy Fund is created to support this effort. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Data Protection Act; establishes a framework for controlling and processing personal data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 21103367D-ES1
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1392ES1
2021-02-04SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-04SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103367D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103367D-S1
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102919D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591571(n/a)See Bill Text
591581(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1392
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1392+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1392S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1392ES1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103367D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1392AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1392F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1392FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1392FES1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0032+SB1392
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0169+SB1392
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0293SB1392+SB1392
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0366SB1392+SB1392

Bill Comments

feedback