VA SB1390 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Life insurance; specified disease coverage or limited benefit health coverage. Provides that "life insurance" includes additional benefits providing specified disease coverage or limited benefit health coverage if these coverages comply with certain minimum standards established by the State Corporation Commission for individual accident and health insurance policies.
Title
Life insurance; specified disease coverage or limited benefit health coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 186 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1390ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11104041D |