VA SB1387 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission; operational and programmatic efficiency and effectiveness reviews; report. Authorizes the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to establish an operational and programmatic efficiency and effectiveness review and assessment of state agencies, under a contract with a United States-based private management consulting firm. The purpose of the review and assessment is to provide an objective and independent cost-savings assessment of the Commonwealth's organizational structure and its programs in order to provide information to the Governor and the General Assembly to effect savings in expenditures, a reduction in duplication of effort, and programmatic efficiencies in the operation of state government. The bill also (i) provides certain required terms for the contract with the private entity and (ii) requires the Commission to submit a report to the General Assembly on the results of any review and assessment by December 1 of the year in which the review is conducted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission; operational and programmatic efficiency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 10-N) (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
2017-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 726 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1387ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-22SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 10-N)
2017-02-21HousePassed House with amendment (82-Y 10-N)
2017-02-21HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2017-02-21HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-21HouseRead third time
2017-02-20HouseRead second time
2017-02-16HouseReported from Rules with amendment (11-Y 4-N)
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2017-02-08HouseRead first time
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-06SenatePrinted as engrossed 17103779D-E
2017-02-06SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1387E
2017-02-06SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-02-06SenateReading of amendments waived
2017-02-06SenateRead second time
2017-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-02-02SenateReported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2017-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103779D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1387
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1387+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1387E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1387ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0726+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S10V0008+SB1387
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0296SB1387+SB1387
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0319SB1387+SB1387
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0320SB1387+SB1387
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H20V0115+SB1387
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2557+SB1387
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0841SB1387+SB1387

Bill Comments

feedback