VA SB1384 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0554)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0554)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor carrier size and weight limitations; compliance with federal law. Amends several size and weight provisions to comply with the federal Fixing America's Surface Transportation Act of 2015 (the FAST Act). The bill (i) allows automobile and watercraft carriers to backhaul general cargo; (ii) permits the commercial delivery of towaway trailers within limits prescribed by the FAST Act; (iii) increases the weight limits of certain emergency vehicles, natural gas vehicles, and emergency towing vehicles as required by the FAST Act; (iv) increases the weight at which a vehicle must be inspected at a permanent weighing station; (v) makes overweight permits available for tank vehicles hauling fluid milk; and (vi) permits contractors of a Medicaid Managed Care Organization to obtain a certificate of fitness as a nonemergency medical transportation carrier.
Title
Motor carrier size and weight limitations; with federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0554) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 554 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1384ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17102157D-E |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1384E |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102157D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1114.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1117.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1127.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1129.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1137 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1139 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1141 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1151.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |