VA SB1382 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Purchase, possession, sale, transfer, etc., of assault firearms and certain ammunition feeding devices prohibited; penalty. Creates a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person who imports, sells, manufactures, purchases, possesses, transports, or transfers an assault firearm, as that term is defined in the bill, and prohibits a person who has been convicted of such violation from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm for a period of three years from the date of conviction. The bill provides that an assault firearm does not include any firearm that is an antique firearm, has been rendered permanently inoperable, is manually operated by bolt, pump, lever, or slide action, or was manufactured before July 1, 2023. The bill also prohibits the sale of a large capacity ammunition feeding device, as that term is defined in the bill. The bill provides that any person who willfully and intentionally (i) sells an assault firearm to another person or (ii) purchases an assault firearm from another person is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor and that any person who imports, sells, barters, or transfers a large capacity ammunition feeding device is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person younger than 21 years of age to import, sell, manufacture, purchase, possess, transport, or transfer an assault firearm regardless of the date of manufacture of such assault firearm. Purchase, possession, sale, transfer, etc., of assault firearms and certain ammunition feeding devices prohibited; penalty. Creates a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person who imports, sells, manufactures, purchases, possesses, transports, or transfers an assault firearm, as that term is defined in the bill, and prohibits a person who has been convicted of such violation from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm for a period of three years from the date of conviction. The bill provides that an assault firearm does not include any firearm that is an antique firearm, has been rendered permanently inoperable, is manually operated by bolt, pump, lever, or slide action, or was manufactured before July 1, 2023. The bill also prohibits the sale of a large capacity ammunition feeding device, as that term is defined in the bill. The bill provides that any person who willfully and intentionally (i) sells an assault firearm to another person or (ii) purchases an assault firearm from another person is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor and that any person who imports, sells, barters, or transfers a large capacity ammunition feeding device is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person younger than 21 years of age to import, sell, manufacture, purchase, possess, transport, or transfer an assault firearm regardless of the date of manufacture of such assault firearm.
Title
Assault firearms and certain ammunition feeding devices; purchase, possession, etc., prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2023-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1382S2 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105315D-S2 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 23104992D-S1 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105315D-S2 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Incorporates SB1283 (Edwards) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Incorporates SB918 (Morrissey) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23104992D-S1 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Incorporates SB1283 (Edwards) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Incorporates SB918 (Morrissey) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104134D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 915.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 287.4:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 287.4:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1:9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |