VA SB1381 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1381
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Possessing or transporting a weapon within Capitol Square or into building owned or leased by the Commonwealth; penalty. Makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for a person to possess or transport any (i) firearm or other weapon designed or intended to propel a missile or projectile of any kind; (ii) frame, receiver, muffler, silencer, missile, projectile, or ammunition designed for use with a dangerous weapon; or (iii) other dangerous weapon within Capitol Square or into any building owned or leased by the Commonwealth. A dangerous weapon includes a bowie knife, switchblade knife, ballistic knife, machete, razor, slingshot, spring stick, fighting chain, throwing star, and oriental dart or any weapon of like kind. The bill provides exceptions for law-enforcement officers, retired state police officers, conservators of the peace, magistrates, court officers, judges, county or city treasurers, commissioners or deputy commissioners of the Virginia Workers' Compensation Commission, authorized security personnel, bail bondsmen, bail enforcement agents, and active military personnel while in the conduct of such persons' official duties. The bill requires that notice of the provisions prohibiting the possessing or transporting of such weapons be posted at each public entrance to Capitol Square or such building owned or leased by the Commonwealth. The bill also provides that any weapon or item possessed or transported in violation of these provisions is subject to seizure by a law-enforcement officer and forfeiture to the Commonwealth. Possessing or transporting a weapon within Capitol Square or into building owned or leased by the Commonwealth; penalty. Makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for a person to possess or transport any (i) firearm or other weapon designed or intended to propel a missile or projectile of any kind; (ii) frame, receiver, muffler, silencer, missile, projectile, or ammunition designed for use with a dangerous weapon; or (iii) other dangerous weapon within Capitol Square or into any building owned or leased by the Commonwealth. A dangerous weapon includes a bowie knife, switchblade knife, ballistic knife, machete, razor, slingshot, spring stick, fighting chain, throwing star, and oriental dart or any weapon of like kind. The bill provides exceptions for law-enforcement officers, retired state police officers, conservators of the peace, magistrates, court officers, judges, county or city treasurers, commissioners or deputy commissioners of the Virginia Workers' Compensation Commission, authorized security personnel, bail bondsmen, bail enforcement agents, and active military personnel while in the conduct of such persons' official duties. The bill requires that notice of the provisions prohibiting the possessing or transporting of such weapons be posted at each public entrance to Capitol Square or such building owned or leased by the Commonwealth. The bill also provides that any weapon or item possessed or transported in violation of these provisions is subject to seizure by a law-enforcement officer and forfeiture to the Commonwealth.
Title
Weapons; possessing or transporting within Capitol Square, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1381S1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103907D-S1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103907D-S1 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102656D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1381 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Public Safety by voice vote