VA SB1379 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; criteria for grants or loans from the fund. Reduces, among other things, the threshold for private investment and new job creation from $10 million and 100 new jobs to $5 million and at least 50 new jobs, and allows for awards from the Fund for projects with a minimum private investment of $100 million that create at least 25 new jobs. The bill also sets forth new investment and job creation thresholds for projects in fiscally stressed localities. This bill incorporates
Title
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; criteria for grants or loans from Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 587 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1379ER) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-17 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1379S1 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104789D-S1 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Incorporates SB1050 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104789D-S1 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11101318D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1050 (Similar To) 2011-01-27 - Senate: Incorporated by Finance (SB1379-Stanley) (13-Y 0-N)
HB1982 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574)
HB1982 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574)