VA SB1377 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of General Services; state-owned communication towers; charges for use. Removes the requirement that the amount charged to lease use of a state-owned communication tower be commensurate with the amount paid for use of comparable space on similar towers.
Title
State-owned communication towers; charges for use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351) | |
2015-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 351 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1377ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103832D |