VA SB1375 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for COVID-19. Establishes a presumption that COVID-19 causing the death or disability of firefighters, emergency medical services personnel, law-enforcement officers, and correctional officers is an occupational disease compensable under the Workers' Compensation Act. The bill provides that the COVID-19 virus is established by a positive diagnostic test for COVID-19, an incubation period consistent with COVID-19, and signs and symptoms of COVID-19 that require medical treatment and only applies to a person who was diagnosed a person who was diagnosed with the COVID-19 virus on or after July 1, 2021, and whose death or disability caused by infection from the COVID-19 virus occurred on or after July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-04SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1375S1
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21104340D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateIncorporates SB1342 (Vogel)
2021-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104340D-S1
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-25SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101733D

Same As/Similar To

SB1342 (Similar To) 2021-02-02 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
SB1342 (Similar To) 2021-02-02 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
652402.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback