VA SB1366 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1366
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Aging services; social need. Requires the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services, in providing aging services, to use available resources to provide services to older persons with the greatest economic or social needs. The bill defines "economic need" as need resulting from an income level at or below the poverty line. The bill defines "social need" as need caused by noneconomic factors, including (i) physical and mental disabilities, which include developmental disabilities and human immunodeficiency virus; (ii) language barriers; and (iii) cultural, social, or geographic isolation, including that which is related to a history of discrimination for factors such as racial or ethnic status, gender identity, gender expression, or sexual orientation that can affect an individual's ability to perform normal daily tasks or threatens such individual's capacity to live independently.
Title
Aging services; economic and social needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N) (Y: 3 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N) (Y: 3 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 300 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1366ER) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N) |
2021-02-27 | House | VOTE: Agreed To (57-Y 42-N) |
2021-02-27 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (57-Y 42-N) |
2021-02-27 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2021-02-24 | House | Delegates: Adams, D.M., Cole, J.G., Coyner |
2021-02-24 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Favola, Reeves |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | House requested conference committee |
2021-02-19 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2021-02-18 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House with substitute (58-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1366H1 |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21200122D-H1 |
2021-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200122D-H1 |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (14-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1366S2 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Barker agreed to 21103857D-S2 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 21103044D-S1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21103857D-S2 (Barker) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103044D-S1 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102410D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1366 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
HB1805 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
HB1805 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
HB1805 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
HB1805 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)