VA SB1366 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation network company partner vehicle registration repeal. Removes the requirement that a transportation network company (TNC) partner register his personal vehicle for use as a TNC partner vehicle with the Department of Motor Vehicles. The bill allows the Department of State Police to recognize another state's annual motor vehicle safety inspection in lieu of a Virginia inspection and clarifies that a TNC partner can keep proof of inspection in or on the vehicle. The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill is identical to HB 2019.
Title
Transportation network company partner; vehicle registration repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 708 (effective 3/24/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1366ER) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2017-02-13 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17103845D-E |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1366E |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103845D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 2000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2001.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2011.20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2011.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |