VA SB1365 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Local regulation of materials recovery facilities. Provides that an ordinance adopted by a locality that would prevent or prohibit the disposal of garbage, trash, or refuse does not include any facility-generated waste residue from a materials recovery facility, as defined in the bill, that has been issued a permit by the Department of Environmental Quality. Local regulation of materials recovery facilities. Provides that an ordinance adopted by a locality that would prevent or prohibit the disposal of garbage, trash, or refuse does not include any facility-generated waste residue from a materials recovery facility, as defined in the bill, that has been issued a permit by the Department of Environmental Quality.
Title
Materials recovery facilities; local regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 7-N 1-A) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 7-N 1-A) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 4-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2023-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 7-N 1-A) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1365S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105817D-S1 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105817D-S1 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102425D |