VA SB1363 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Registered apprentices; children 16 years of age or older; barbershop or cosmetology salon. Permits children 16 years of age or older who are registered apprentices to serve in a barbershop or cosmetology salon licensed by the Board for Barbers and Cosmetology in accordance with the Board's regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registered apprentices; persons 16 yrs. of age or older may serve in barbershop/cosmetology salon.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0275)
2023-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 275 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-23SenateSigned by President
2023-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1363ER)
2023-02-22SenateEnrolled
2023-02-17HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17HouseRead third time
2023-02-16HouseRead second time
2023-02-14HouseReported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N)
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
2023-02-10HouseRead first time
2023-02-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1363S1
2023-01-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23105244D-S1
2023-01-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-01-26SenateRead second time
2023-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2023-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 23105244D-S1
2023-01-23SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2023-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2023-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100114D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SB1363
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1363+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1363S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SB1363ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0275+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105244D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1363FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+SB1363FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S02V0034+SB1363
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0112SB1363+SB1363
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0129SB1363+SB1363
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H23V0142+SB1363
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1963+SB1363

Bill Comments

feedback