VA SB1363 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0553)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0553)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Transportation to convene a task force to study the feasibility of establishing a statewide one-stop online portal for address changes; report. Requires the Secretary of Transportation or his designee to convene a task force to study the feasibility of establishing a one-stop online portal for citizen address changes in order to develop a single statewide address database for utilization by state entities. The task force shall submit to the Governor and the General Assembly a report on its findings and recommendations by November 1, 2017. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2018.
Title
Statewide one-stop online portal for address changes; Secretary of Transportation to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0553) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 553 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB1363ER) |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1363ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17103120D-E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1363E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103120D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Computer Services and Uses
Databases
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Transportation Secretary of
Uncodified Legislation
Computer Services and Uses
Databases
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Transportation Secretary of
Uncodified Legislation