VA SB1362 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Employers; reporting outbreaks of COVID-19. Requires that, upon determination that a worksite cluster of COVID-19 has occurred at a workplace with 50 or more employees, the Department of Health (the Department) shall make a report available to the public on a website maintained by the Department that includes (i) the name of the employer at which a worksite cluster has been reported and (ii) the number of confirmed cases of COVID-19 reported by such employer. The Department shall also report when previously reported outbreaks are under control. The bill defines "worksite cluster" as five or more cases with illness onset or initial positive results within a 14-day period and a likely epidemiologic linkage between cases. The bill provides that the provisions of the act shall expire upon expiration of the Governor's declared state of emergency in response to the continued spread of the SARS-CoV-2 novel coronavirus, or COVID-19. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act. Employers; reporting outbreaks of COVID-19. Requires that, upon determination that a worksite cluster of COVID-19 has occurred at a workplace with 50 or more employees, the Department of Health (the Department) shall make a report available to the public on a website maintained by the Department that includes (i) the name of the employer at which a worksite cluster has been reported and (ii) the number of confirmed cases of COVID-19 reported by such employer. The Department shall also report when previously reported outbreaks are under control. The bill defines "worksite cluster" as five or more cases with illness onset or initial positive results within a 14-day period and a likely epidemiologic linkage between cases. The bill provides that the provisions of the act shall expire upon expiration of the Governor's declared state of emergency in response to the continued spread of the SARS-CoV-2 novel coronavirus, or COVID-19. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employers; reporting outbreaks of COVID-19, effective clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 11-N) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenatePassed Senate (27-Y 11-N)
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateEmergency clause deleted
2021-02-05SenatePrinted as reengrossed 21103783D-E2S1
2021-02-05SenateReengrossed by Senate committee substitute with amendments SB1362E2S1
2021-02-05SenateAmendment by Senator Lewis agreed to
2021-02-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-05SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2021-02-05SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateRequires 32 affirmative votes for passage
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and defeated by Senate (29-Y 10-N)
2021-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 21103783D-ES1
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1362ES1
2021-02-04SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-04SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103783D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 3-N)
2021-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103783D-S1
2021-01-28SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
2021-01-22SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2021-01-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102087D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1362
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1362+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1362S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1362ES1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1362E2+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103783D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1362AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1362F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1362FES1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0062+SB1362
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0122+SB1362
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0293SB1362+SB1362
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0361SB1362+SB1362
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0362SB1362+SB1362
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0383SB1362+SB1362
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0384SB1362+SB1362
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0385SB1362+SB1362

Bill Comments

feedback