VA SB1362 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying concealed weapons; exemption for nonduty status military personnel. Provides that a member of the Virginia National Guard, Armed Forces of the United States, or Armed Forces Reserves of the United States in a nonduty status may carry a concealed weapon wherever such member may travel in the Commonwealth, provided that such member is carrying his valid military identification card.
Title
Concealed weapons; nonduty status active military personnel may carry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1362ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House with amendments (67-Y 32-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-22 | House | Amendment by Delegate Lingamfelter agreed to |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (16-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1362S1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104447D-S1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Incorporates SB1297 (Vogel) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104447D-S1 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101855D |