VA SB1361 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Food donation tax credit. Allows restaurants that donate prepared food or meals to a nonprofit food bank to claim the food donation tax credit. Under current law, only farmers that donate food crops to a nonprofit food bank are eligible for the credit. Current law allows a maximum of $5,000 in credits to be issued per taxpayer per year and an aggregate maximum of $250,000 in credits to be issued by the Tax Commissioner per fiscal year.
Title
Food donation; tax credit for restaurants that donate prepared food or meals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Finance |
2017-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100879D |