VA SB1356 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Informal truancy plans. Provides that a student may have multiple discretionary diversions for truancy so long as no previous diversion occurred during the same school year. The bill extends the time frame for an informal truancy plan from 90 days to 120 days.
Title
Informal truancy plans; students with multiple discretionary diversions.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101609D |