VA SB1356 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limited liability companies; derivative actions. Removes a provision that allows a member of a limited liability company to bring a derivative action without first demanding that the members or managers of the limited liability company bring the action if an effort to cause the members or managers to bring the action is not likely to succeed. Without this "futility" exception, a member will be required in every case to make a demand on the limited liability company before bringing a derivative action. A member shall not bring a derivative proceeding unless he fairly and adequately represents the interests of the limited liability company and is a proper plaintiff.
Title
Limited liability companies; derivative actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379) | |
2011-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 379 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1356ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House with amendment (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-22 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (21-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102336D |