VA SB1353 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; members of governing boards; duties. Provides that the primary duty of any member of a governing board of a public institution of higher education is to the Commonwealth. The bill requires that the educational programs for the governing boards of public institutions of higher education, developed by the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, shall include presentations on such primary duty.
Title
Higher educational institutions; primary duties of members of governing boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102869D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 1300.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |