VA SB1351 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1351
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; claims not barred. Provides that an order issued by the Workers' Compensation Commission awarding or denying benefits shall not bar by res judicata any claim by an employee or cause a waiver, abandonment, or dismissal of any claim by an employee if the order does not expressly adjudicate such claim. Workers' compensation; claims not barred. Provides that an order issued by the Workers' Compensation Commission awarding or denying benefits shall not bar by res judicata any claim by an employee or cause a waiver, abandonment, or dismissal of any claim by an employee if the order does not expressly adjudicate such claim.
Title
Workers' compensation; claims not barred.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 515 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1351ER) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101731D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1351 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote