VA SB1351 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Polling place; authorized representative of political party; permitted handheld wireless communication devices. Removes the prohibition against use of handheld wireless communications devices containing a camera or other imaging device by authorized representatives of political parties inside a polling place or central absentee voter precinct, but prohibits the use of such device to capture a digital image inside the polling place or central absentee voter precinct.
Title
Polling place; authorized representative of political party permitted, handheld wireless devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 575 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1351ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House (95-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 3-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15103125D-E |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1351E |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (12-Y 3-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103125D |