VA SB1350 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority; assess licensing scheme for liquid nicotine; report. Directs the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority, in consultation with stakeholders, to assess (i) a potential licensing scheme for manufacturers, distributors, and retail dealers of liquid nicotine in the Commonwealth and (ii) the most appropriate manner and entity to enforce and administer licensing, age verification, product verification, and advertising restrictions related to the sale of liquid nicotine. The bill requires the Authority to report its findings and any recommendations to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations, the House Committee on Finance, and the House Committee on Appropriations by November 1, 2023.
Title
Liquid nicotine; Va. Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority, et al., to assess a licensing scheme.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (87-Y 5-N) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 6-N) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 6-N) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761) | |
2023-04-12 | House | Enacted, Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/23) |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1350ER2) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2023-04-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (87-Y 5-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (87-Y 5-N) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1350ER) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 6-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed House with amendment (90-Y 6-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1350S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105634D-S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105634D-S1 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104245D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2296 (Same As) 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
HB2296 (Same As) 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
HB2296 (Same As) 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
Subjects
Authorities
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Tobacco and Tobacco Products
Uncodified Legislation
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Tobacco and Tobacco Products
Uncodified Legislation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 1021.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.04:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1021.06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |