VA SB1350 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1350
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation projects; resiliency. Requires the Commonwealth Transportation Board to determine whether a project has been designed to be or the project sponsor has committed that the design will be resilient when evaluating projects for the Six-Year Improvement Program and consider resiliency when establishing the Statewide Transportation Plan. The bill also requires the Commissioner of Highways to ensure resiliency is incorporated into the design standards for new construction projects.
Title
Transportation funding; statewide prioritization process, resiliency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052) | |
2021-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 52 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB1350ER) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1350ER) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-18 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House with amendment (81-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (15-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1350S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103492D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103492D-S1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101744D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1350 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
HB2071 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
HB2071 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
HB2071 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
HB2071 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0051)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 2 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 214.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 371 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |