VA SB1350 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Irvington. Updates the town's boundary description. Other changes replace outdated provisions regarding the timing of town council elections and the mayor's duties. This bill is identical to HB 1895.
Title
Irvington, Town of; amending charter, updates town's boundary description, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 113 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1350ER) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103724D-E |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1350E |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (9-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103724D |