VA SB1350 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle sales and use tax; refund. Allows a purchaser to be refunded any motor vehicle sales and use tax paid if the vehicle is returned pursuant to the Virginia Motor Vehicle Warranty Act, or if the vehicle is returned within 45 days of purchase, and the purchase price is refunded, due to a mechanical defect or failure. The bill requires a person claiming the refund due to a mechanical defect or failure to submit an affidavit to the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles stating that the vehicle was returned due to a mechanical defect or failure, the purchase price was refunded, the title was assigned to the person accepting the return, and the purchaser no longer has possession of the vehicle.
Title
Motor vehicle sales and use tax; refund to purchaser.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 552 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1350ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1350S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104615D-S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104615D-S1 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101471D |