VA SB1349 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1349
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; exemptions; email addresses of licensed professionals. Modifies current law to provide that electronic mail addresses of persons applying for or possessing a license to engage in the practice of any profession in the Commonwealth may also be disseminated, in addition to such person's name and address, by the agency maintaining such information.
Title
Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; exemptions, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected motion to accede to request for a conference committee (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Failed to pass |
2021-03-01 | Senate | No further action taken |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate rejected motion to accede to request for a conference committee (0-Y 39-N) |
2021-02-23 | House | House requested conference committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2021-02-22 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed House with substitute (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1349H1 |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21200251D-H1 |
2021-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200251D-H1 |
2021-02-15 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (19-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101187D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1349 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote