VA SB1348 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0371)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Education; energy career cluster. Requires the Department of Education, in consultation with representatives from pertinent industries such as renewable energy, natural gas, nuclear energy, coal, and oil, to establish an energy career cluster. The bill requires the Department of Education to base the knowledge and skill sets contained in such energy career cluster on the energy industry competency and credential models developed by the Center for Energy Workforce Development in partnership with the U.S. Department of Labor. The bill further requires the Department of Education to report to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health no later than December 1, 2019, on its progress toward establishing such energy career cluster. This bill is identical to HB 2008.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy career cluster; Department of Education, et al., to establish, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0371)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 371 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1348ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-24SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103857D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1348
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1348+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1348ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0371+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0084+SB1348
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0226+SB1348
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1348+SB1348
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0415SB1348+SB1348
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0416SB1348+SB1348
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0134+SB1348
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2685+SB1348

Bill Comments

feedback