VA SB1347 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying a switchblade knife; exception. Authorizes any person to carry a switchblade knife concealed when such knife is carried for the purpose of engaging in a lawful profession or lawful recreational activity the performance of which is aided by the use of a switchblade knife. The bill removes switchblade knives from the list of weapons the selling, bartering, giving, or furnishing of which is a Class 4 misdemeanor. This bill is identical to HB 1432.
Title
Switchblade knife; person may carry concealed, exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N 1-A) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N 1-A) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1347ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 40-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House with amendment (58-Y 40-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N 1-A) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1347S1 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104362D-S1 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104362D-S1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100568D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 287.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 141 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |