VA SB1343 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1343

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; proprietary records and trade secrets; carbon sequestration agreements. Excludes from the mandatory disclosure provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act proprietary information, voluntarily provided by a private business under a promise of confidentiality from a public body, used by the public body for a carbon sequestration agreement. The bill requires the private business to specify the records for which protection is sought before submitting them to the public body and to state the reasons why protection is necessary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; proprietary records and trade secrets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 7-N 1-A) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 298 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1343ER)
2021-03-09SenateEnrolled
2021-02-25HouseVOTE: Passage (88-Y 7-N 1-A)
2021-02-25HousePassed House (88-Y 7-N 1-A)
2021-02-25HouseRead third time
2021-02-24HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-23HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-23HouseRead third time
2021-02-22HouseRead second time
2021-02-18HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101724D

Same As/Similar To

SB1343 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223705.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1343
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1343+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1343ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0298+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1343F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1343FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0022+SB1343
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0080SB1343+SB1343
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0126SB1343+SB1343
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1104V0004+SB1343
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0025+SB1343
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1959+SB1343

Bill Comments 750

feedback