VA SB1339 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expungement and sealing of police and court records; Expungement Fee Fund created; protection of public record information; penalties. Establishes a process for the sealing of police and court records, defined in the bill, of criminal records for certain convictions, deferred dispositions, and acquittals and for offenses that have been nolle prossed or otherwise dismissed. The bill also allows a person to petition for the expungement of the police and court records relating to convictions of marijuana possession, underage alcohol or tobacco possession, and using a false ID to obtain alcohol and for deferred disposition dismissals for possession of controlled substances or marijuana, underage alcohol or tobacco possession, and using a false ID to obtain alcohol. Expungement and sealing of police and court records; Expungement Fee Fund created; protection of public record information; penalties. Establishes a process for the sealing of police and court records, defined in the bill, of criminal records for certain convictions, deferred dispositions, and acquittals and for offenses that have been nolle prossed or otherwise dismissed. The bill also allows a person to petition for the expungement of the police and court records relating to convictions of marijuana possession, underage alcohol or tobacco possession, and using a false ID to obtain alcohol and for deferred disposition dismissals for possession of controlled substances or marijuana, underage alcohol or tobacco possession, and using a false ID to obtain alcohol. The bill creates the Expungement Fee Fund, which is funded by all collected expungement fees. The bill provides that expungement fees shall not be refundable, but persons who are indigent or represented by court-appointed counsel shall not be required to pay such fees. The Fund is administered by the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court and used to fund the costs of court-appointed counsel. The bill requires a business screening service, which is a business that conducts criminal history records searches, must register with the Department of State Police to receive expungement orders and must follow reasonable procedures to ensure it maintains accurate information. The bill directs the Attorney General to enforce these requirements, authorizing it to file suit for damages and a civil penalty of up to $2,500. With the exception of the provisions regarding the Expungement Fee Fund, and the funding provisions of such fund, the bill has delayed effective date of July 1, 2022. The bill directs the Department of Criminal Justice Services to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police and court records; expungement and sealing of records, Expungement Fee Fund created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 3-N 3-A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2021-02-05SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1339S3
2021-02-04SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 21104416D-S3
2021-02-04SenateFloor substitute printed 21104416D-S3 (Surovell)
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute rejected 21104284D-S2
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute rejected 21103918D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104284D-S2
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 3-N)
2021-02-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103918D-S1
2021-02-01SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-01SenateIncorporates SB1372 (Lucas)
2021-02-01SenateIncorporates SB1283 (Morrissey)
2021-02-01SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 3-N 3-A)
2021-01-26SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Expungement
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100793D

Same As/Similar To

SB1283 (Similar To) 2021-02-01 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB1372 (Similar To) 2021-02-01 - Incorporated by Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171205.1(n/a)See Bill Text
171502(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.1:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.2:3(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.4(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.5(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.6(n/a)See Bill Text
80140.5(n/a)See Bill Text
91128(n/a)See Bill Text
91134(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1339
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1339+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1339S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1339S2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1339S3+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103918D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1339F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1339F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1339FS1160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1339FS2160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1339FS3160+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0101+SB1339
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0153+SB1339
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0293SB1339+SB1339
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0353SB1339+SB1339
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0354SB1339+SB1339
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0355SB1339+SB1339

Bill Comments

feedback