VA SB1339 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Careless driving; cause of injury to vulnerable road user. Provides that a person who operates a motor vehicle in a careless or distracted manner and is the proximate cause of serious physical injury to a vulnerable road user, defined in the bill as a pedestrian or person riding a bicycle, electric wheelchair, electric bicycle, wheelchair, skateboard, skates, foot-scooter, animal, or animal-drawn vehicle, is guilty of a traffic infraction.
Title
Careless driving; infliction of injury on vulnerable road user.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred from Transportation by voice vote |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17102825D-E |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1339E |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (9-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102825D |